GA SR50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION expressing cultural, economic, and educational cooperation with the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland and commending the Consul General Andrew Staunton of the United Kingdom for his indefatigable efforts on behalf of the special relationship between the United Kingdom and the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland; express cultural, economic, and educational cooperation
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Sen. Sheikh Rahman [D] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54377 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/179840 |