GA SR381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION requesting that the State Department of Economic Development cooperate with Queen Blessing Itua, Global Empowerment Movement (GEM); and for other purposes.
Title
State Department of Economic Development; cooperate with Queen Blessing Itua, Global Empowerment Movement (GEM); request
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #247 (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51229 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/167684 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51229#15317 |