GA SR351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION commending Grady Memorial Hospital and Grady Health System on the occasion of its 125th anniversary; and for other purposes.
Title
Grady Memorial Hospital; commend
Sponsors
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/51170 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/167328 |