GA SR265 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on State-Local Government Mandate Review; and for other purposes.
Title
State-Local Government Mandate Review; create joint study committee
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read and Referred |