GA SR231 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Department of Community Health to implement a public information campaign about folic acid consumption; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Health, Dept. of; urge to implement a public information campaign about folic acid consumption
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/33028 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/sr231_As_introduced_LC_36_1803_2.htm |