GA SR204 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Act 279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Act 279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life of Mr. Kyle Gilbert and dedicating a road in his memory; and for other purposes.
Title
Kyle Gilbert Memorial Highway; Gwinnett County; dedicate
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #341 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #331 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #129 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #331 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #129 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Act 279 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |