GA SR149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION designating September 1 as Childhood Cancer Awareness Day in Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Childhood Cancer Awareness Day; designate September 1
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |