GA SR140 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Georgia so as to authorize the Georgia General Assembly to provide by general law for sports betting in this state; to provide for the regulation and allocation of revenues of such activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia General Assembly; general law for sports betting in this state; provide- CA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute: Senate Vote #140 (Y: 30 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #139 (Y: 9 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #138 (Y: 4 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #137 (Y: 12 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #139 (Y: 9 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #138 (Y: 4 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #137 (Y: 12 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |