GA SR1299 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration to update Standard 302 of the Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards; and for other purposes.
Title
National Highway Traffic Safety Admin.; urged to update Standard 302 of the Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #697 - Adoption (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read and Referred |