GA SR1222 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Composite Medical Board to promulgate regulations which establish medically accepted standards of patient care in office based surgery and anesthesia; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Composite Medical Board; urged to promulgate regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #757 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred |