GA SR122 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION designating the song "The Veteran Anthem," with lyrics and music by Takosha M. Swan, as the official song of Georgia service members, veterans, and their families; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"The Veteran Anthem"; official song of Georgia service members, veterans, and their families; designate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-01-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback