GA SR115 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life and memory of Apostle Alexander Oyewole Bamgbola; and for other purposes.
Title
Bamgbola, Apostle Alexander Oyewole; condolences
Sponsors
Sen. Donzella James [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Nikki Merritt [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Sen. Valencia Seay [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar Expressing The Will Of The Senate: Senate Vote #231 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |