GA SR11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing the Georgia Recyclers Association, the Georgia Recycling Coalition, and the Institute of Scrap Recycling Industries and their employees as essential and commending them for their economic contributions to Georgia; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Recyclers Association, the Georgia Recycling Coalition, and the Institute of Scrap Recycling Industries and their employees; recognize

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-01-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-01-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback