GA SR1027 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the SPLOST Reform Joint Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
SPLOST Reform Joint Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #550 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |