GA SR1019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Advanced Communications Technologies and Use of State and Local Government Right of Way Policy Modernization Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Advanced Communications Technologies and Use of State and Local Government Right of Way Policy Modernization Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |