GA SB99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-3-34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to disclosure and dissemination of criminal records to private persons and businesses, resulting responsibility and liability of the Georgia Crime Information Center, and provision of certain information to the FBI in conjunction with the National Instant Criminal Background Check System, so as to provide for a judicial procedure for purging a person's involuntary hospitalization information received by the center for the purpose of the National Instant Criminal Background Check System under certain circumstances; to change provisions relating to the retention of a person's involuntary hospitalization information; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Crime Information Center; purging a person's hospitalization information for purpose of National Instant Criminal Background Check; provide for a judicial procedure
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Vincent Fort [D] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #142 (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #143 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #143 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |