GA SB94 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to criminal procedure, so as to require a procedure for enhancing witness identification accuracy; to provide for definitions; to provide for written policies relating to witness identification protocol; to provide for policy requirements; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure; require a procedure for enhancing witness identification accuracy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #345 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #436 (Y: 100 N: 65 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Vote #291 (Y: 137 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #55 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01 Effective Date
2015-05-06 Act 173
2015-05-06SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2015-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2015-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2015-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
2015-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-03-19HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-03-02HouseHouse First Readers
2015-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2015-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-02-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-09SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43435
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/147082
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/149096
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/149421
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/151583
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/152128
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/152157
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/153952
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/153953
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43435#12270
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43435#12622
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43435#12980
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43435#12858

Bill Comments 750

feedback