GA SB9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to invasion of privacy, so as to prohibit sexual extortion; to provide for definitions; to provide for elements of the crime; to provide for penalties; to provide for venue; to amend Code Section 42-1-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Sexual Offender Registry, so as to provide a conforming cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Invasion of Privacy; sexual extortion; prohibit; definitions; elements of the crime; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #410 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #414 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #298 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #414 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #298 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 295 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-26 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |