GA SB87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the membership of the Toombs County Development Authority, approved March 2, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 3640), which authority was created pursuant to an amendment to the Constitution as contained in Ga. L. 1966, p. 787, and continued by an Act approved March 20, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 3962), so as to provide for the qualifications of members of said authority; to provide for terms of certain members of District No. 2 of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Toombs County Development Authority; qualifications of members of said authority; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #232 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #54 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #54 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 191 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |