GA SB87 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 44-13-100 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions for purposes of bankruptcy and intestate insolvent estates, so as to provide for the discharge of judgments against exempt property in bankruptcy; to provide for procedure; to provide for the effect of an order; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bankruptcy; judgments against exempt property; provide for the discharge
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #382 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #421 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #420 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #48 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #421 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #420 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #48 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 234 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |