GA SB87 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to marketing facilities, organizations, and programs, so as to repeal the roadside markets incentive program; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Roadside Markets Incentive Program; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #322 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #37 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #37 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 209 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |