GA SB85 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-5-61 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hazing, so as to provide for an expanded definition of hazing; to provide for inclusion of minors as the subject of hazing; to provide for penalties; to provide for the Attorney General to bring civil actions against certain organizations regarding hazing incidents; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding education, so as to provide for mandatory reports of hazing related violations at schools in the state; to provide for and revise definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Max Gruver Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #374 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #337 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #86 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #337 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #86 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 144 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |