GA SB84 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for an advisory referendum election to be held in the City of Tybee Island for the purpose of determining if the construction of a public swimming pool with municipal funds is desired by the people of said city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tybee Island, City of; provide for an advisory referendum election; construction of a public swimming pool
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House Vote #75 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #24 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #24 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 170 | |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |