GA SB76 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the state employees' health insurance plan and post-employment health benefit fund, so as to provide for state health benefit plans to cover insulin medication at a reduced rate; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employees' Health Insurance Plan; state health benefit plans to cover insulin medication at a reduced rate; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #859 (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #169 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-06SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-06SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-02SenateSenate Tabled
2023-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-02SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback