GA SB74 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Juvenile Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Juvenile Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-684 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the conduct of a hearing for the petition of an unemancipated minor seeking a waiver of the parental notification requirement for an abortion and appeal, so as to provide for clear and convincing evidence as the proper standard of proof; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; parental notification of abortion; provide for clear and convincing evidence for waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #496 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |