GA SB68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to strengthen provisions relating to the financial management of local school systems; to provide for training for local board of education members and local school superintendents on financial management; to provide for monthly reporting to the local board of education on the financial stability of the local school system; to provide for designation by the Department of Audits and Accounts of high-risk local school systems and moderate-risk local school systems based on annual audits; to provide for financial management provisions in flexibility contracts and system charters; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local School Systems; financial management; strengthen provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #780 (Y: 159 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #778 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #376 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #354 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #56 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #778 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #376 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #354 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #56 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 389 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2020-03-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 11th, 74th |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 12th, 9th, 31st |
2019-04-02 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |