GA SB68 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to establish Celebrate Freedom Week; to provide for the posting of historical documents; to require the Department of Education to develop online resources and instructional support; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Celebrate Freedom Week; establish; posting of historical documents
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #71 (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |