GA SB61 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 59 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to life settlements, so as to provide a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for license requirements for providers and registration requirements for life settlement brokers; to provide suspension, revocation, and refusal to renew of such licenses; to provide for requirements for life settlement contracts; to provide for certain reporting requirements; to provide for certain privacy requirements; to provide for the examination of licensees; to provide for the authority of the Commissioner of Insurance to investigate persons involved in the life settlement business and in suspected fraudulent practices; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Life Settlements Act; license/registration requirements for life settlement brokers; definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #339 - Pass (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #18 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #18 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-30 | Act 93 | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-06 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-05 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-04 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-04 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-02 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-01-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-29 | Senate Read and Referred |