GA SB6 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-5-30 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to restricted licenses, so as to change the penalty for violation of restrictions of a driver's license; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Driver's Licenses; restricted; change the penalty for violation
Sponsors
Sen. John Douglas [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] |
Sen. John Wiles [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #924 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #45 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #45 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 623 | |
2010-06-03 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-04 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-14 | Senate Read and Referred |