GA SB591 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 14 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to secondary metals recyclers, so as to provide that it shall be illegal for certain persons to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell or attempt to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell used, detached catalytic converters, used utility wire, or used communications copper; to provide for definitions; to regulate and limit the payment allowed by secondary metals recyclers; to provide that certain catalytic converters, used utility wire, and used communications copper and the vehicles transporting them are contraband; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Secondary Metals Recyclers; shall be illegal for certain persons to purchase, possess, obtain, or sell used, detached catalytic converters, used utility wire, or used communications copper; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #660 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | House Postponed |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |