GA SB556 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to issuance, expiration, and renewal of drivers' licenses, so as to provide for the issuance of a driver's license to current and retired peace officers at no charge; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' Licenses; issuance of a driver's license to current and retired peace officers at no charge; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #643 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |