GA SB537 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to provide a new charter for the City of McDonough," enacted during the 2012 regular session of the General Assembly and printed in the 2012 Georgia Laws, so as to amend the powers of the mayor; to provide for a city administrator; to provide for powers and duties of the city administrator; to provide for an acting city administrator; to provide for emergencies; to provide for removal; to provide for vacancies; to provide for a referendum; to provide for a contingent effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
McDonough, City of; amend powers of mayor; provide for a city administrator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #861 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #806 - Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #806 - Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-12 | Act 567 | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-27 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read and Referred |