GA SB535 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide for targeted state funding for projects such as safe parking areas, structured camping facilities, and individual unit shelters; to provide for allocation of state funding under certain conditions; to provide for grant-allocation contracts and state grants; to provide for the designation of structured camping facilities on state property; to provide for a prohibition on use of undesignated state property for camping; to provide for definitions; to provide for applicability; to provide for violations and penalty; to provide for immunity; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Reducing Street Homelessness Act of 2022"; enact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |