GA SB532 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating the City of Doraville in the County of DeKalb, approved October 13, 1971 (Ga. L. 1971, Ex. Sess., p. 2154), as amended, so as to change the corporate limits; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Doraville, City of; change the coporate limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #806 - Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-13 | Act 573 | |
2012-04-13 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-27 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-26 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read and Referred |