GA SB53 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and establish in DeKalb County, Georgia, districts from which the members of the County Board of Education of DeKalb County shall be elected, approved April 12, 1963 (Ga. L. 1963, p. 3424), as amended, so as to provide that the boundaries of an independent school system are not extended by annexation unless expressly approved in a separate referendum; to provide for effective dates; to provide for transfer of students; to provide for ownership of property and buildings; to provide for binding arbitration; to provide for no change in school system boundaries under certain circumstances; to provide for intergovernmental agreements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Board of Education of DeKalb County; boundaries of an independent school system are not extended by annexation; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #15 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V8
2019-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-05SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback