GA SB518 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act establishing the form of government of DeKalb County and fixing the powers and duties of the officers constituting the governing authority of DeKalb County, approved April 9, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 4304), as amended, so as to change the description of commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to revise provisions relating to amending the Act; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; change the description of commissioner districts
Sponsors
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Jason Carter [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Curt Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-04 | Act 439 | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-19 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred |