GA SB5 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 52-2-9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general powers of the Georgia Ports Authority, so as to provide for powers of the authority with respect to acceptance of loans or grants from the United States upon certain terms and conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Ports Authority; provide for powers; acceptance of loans/grants from United States upon certain terms and conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House Vote #48 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #22 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #22 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Effective Date | |
2015-02-23 | Act 2 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |