GA SB495 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 620
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 620
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-2A-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Low THC Oil Patient Registry, so as to provide for the term of validity of a registration card; to provide for delivery of registration cards; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Low THC Oil Patient Registry; term of validity of a registration card; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Jason Esteves [D] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Jordan Ridley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #899 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #868 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #609 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #868 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #609 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 620 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |