GA SB490 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the felony offense of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles and Traffic; felony offense of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #593 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |