GA SB486 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 6 of Chapter 8 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Agricultural Commodity Commission for Propane, so as to provide for full or partial remote communication with regard to public hearings; to provide for notice of hearings; to revise referendum requirements and procedures for issuing, amending, and renewing marketing orders; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agricultural Commodity Commission for Propane; full or partial remote communication with regard to public hearings; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Kim Jackson [D] | Sen. Max Burns [R] | Rep. Danny Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #802 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #585 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #585 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 797 | |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |