GA SB486 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 12 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to effectiveness of educational programs, so as to require administration of either the SAT or the ACT to all public school students in grade 11; to provide for the Department of Education to coordinate with local school superintendents regarding the timing of test administration and students transitioning to and from the Department of Juvenile Justice; to provide that such requirement is contingent upon appropriations by the General Assembly; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Effectiveness of Educational Programs; administration of either the SAT or the ACT to all public schools students in grade 11; require
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Sen. Sheikh Rahman [D] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |