GA SB484 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to exempt the City of Dalton from the election requirement of subsection (a) of Code Section 36-82-61.1 of the O.C.G.A. pursuant to subsection (b) of said Code section; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Dalton; exempt from the election requirement; contingent effective date; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #637 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |