GA SB483 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to organization and members of the Public Service Commission, so as to change the term and manner of the election of the chairperson of the Public Service Commission; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Service Commission; chairperson; change the term/manner of election
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Tim Golden [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #856 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #799 - Recon (Y: 63 N: 97 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #798 - Passage (Y: 94 N: 65 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #799 - Recon (Y: 63 N: 97 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #798 - Passage (Y: 94 N: 65 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #571 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 756 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred |