GA SB47 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to offenses against public health and morals, so as to provide that vaping in restricted areas is a misdemeanor punishable by fine; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Offenses Against Public Health And Morals; vaping in restricted areas is a misdemeanor punishable by fine; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #266 (Y: 152 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #47 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #47 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 75 | |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hopper |