GA SB466 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to employment under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to remove the needs improvement rating from the group of performance evaluation ratings which may adversely impact an educator's ability to obtain a renewable certificate from the Georgia Professional Standards Commission; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Quality Basic Education Act"; employment; needs improvement rating; group of performance evaluation ratings; remove
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #582 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |