GA SB463 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 10 and 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to commerce and trade and motor vehicles and traffic, respectively, so as to provide an exception for certain manufacturers of electric motor vehicles to restrictions on the ownership, operation, and control of motor vehicle dealerships; to provide an exception for electric motor vehicles to the inspection requirements for certificates of title if certain conditions are met; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Electric Motor Vehicles; exception for certain manufacturers; restrictions on the ownership, operation, and control of motor vehicle dealerships; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #531 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |