GA SB46 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to torts, so as to provide for the facilitation of space flight activities in this state; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to limit the liability of space flight entities related to injuries sustained by participants who have agreed in writing to such a limitation after being provided with certain warnings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Torts; space flight activities; provide facilitation; definitions; exceptions
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #419 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #420 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #380 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #56 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #420 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #380 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #56 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 173 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |