GA SB457 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that all offices in this state shall be elected on a partisan basis; to provide for exceptions; to provide for certain referendums and procedures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; provide all offices in this state shall be elected on a partisan basis; exceptions; referendums and procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. Curt Thompson [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Read and Referred |