GA SB451 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations on recovery for deficiencies connected with improvements to realty and resulting injuries, so as to clarify actions that may be brought pursuant to Code Section 9-3-51 regarding deficiencies in connection with improvements to realty; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Deficiencies Connected with Improvements to Realty and Resulting Injuries; actions that may be brought pursuant to Code Section 9-3-51; clarify
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #671 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #621 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #621 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 380 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |