GA SB45 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide for pari-mutuel horse racing in this state at a limited number of licensed equestrian centers; to create the Georgia Horse Racing Commission; to provide for the comprehensive regulation of pari-mutuel and related activities; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to enter into the Interstate Compact on Licensure of Participants in Live Racing with Pari-mutuel Wagering; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Rural Georgia Jobs and Growth Act"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback